U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00022
  • Case Name: Gahagan v. Kraft Heinz Foods Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Costs Taxed]
  • December 13, 2020: [Objections to Bill of Costs]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
  • November 20, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 19, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 17, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 11, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • November 03, 2020: [In Limine]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 01, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • September 08, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 08, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 03, 2020: [Compel]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 31, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 27, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 17, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 14, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 10, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 06, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 05, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 31, 2020: [Compel]
  • July 29, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 29, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 29, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 16, 2020: [Certificate]
  • July 15, 2020: [Compel]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order]
  • May 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 20, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 01, 2020: [Status Report]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 01, 2019: [Status Report]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 23, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • May 01, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • February 27, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.