U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Rife v. Allsteel, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 20, 2020: [Stipulation]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 28, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 28, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 28, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 28, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 24, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • July 22, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 21, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 17, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 15, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 14, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 14, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 14, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 14, 2020: [Bifurcate/Sever]
  • July 08, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 09, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • April 02, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • April 02, 2020: [Leave]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Reply]
  • March 25, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 24, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 24, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 24, 2020: [Reply]
  • March 24, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • March 16, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • March 13, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 13, 2020: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • March 13, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 13, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 11, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 10, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 09, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 09, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 09, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • March 06, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • February 07, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • February 06, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 06, 2020: [Leave]
  • February 06, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 05, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 10, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Status Report]
  • January 08, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Status Report]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • May 30, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 23, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 01, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.