U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-mj-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ericson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • March 05, 2019: [Detention]
  • March 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 05, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2019: [Bail/Bond Report (Sealed )]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • February 28, 2019: [Detention]
  • February 28, 2019: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • February 28, 2019: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • February 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 28, 2019: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • February 28, 2019: [Arrest]
  • February 28, 2019: [Order]
  • February 27, 2019: [Complaint]
  • February 27, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.