U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Vela v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 10, 2019: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 07, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 08, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • May 02, 2019: [Reconsideration]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.