U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00200
  • Case Name: Bratz et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • July 12, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
  • May 14, 2019: [Status Conference]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 21, 2019: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order]
  • March 04, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 04, 2019: [Crossclaim]
  • March 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.