U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00067
  • Case Name: Burt v. State of Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 13, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • May 10, 2019: [Letter]
  • May 09, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 08, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 08, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • May 06, 2019: [Mail Returned]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 24, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 23, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 23, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 23, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order]
  • April 11, 2019: [Notice - Other]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • March 06, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 06, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.