U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00454
  • Case Name: Williams v. Dahm et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice - Other]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 17, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 08, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 01, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 19, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 16, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • February 04, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 03, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • December 18, 2019: [Dismiss]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 24, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • April 24, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 11, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Leave]
  • March 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 06, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • March 06, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.