U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00071
  • Case Name: Vice v. Lee County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Vacate]
  • September 03, 2019: [Stay]
  • September 03, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 03, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 03, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 27, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 27, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 27, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 27, 2019: [Stay]
  • August 27, 2019: [Vacate]
  • August 02, 2019: [Letter]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 22, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 03, 2019: [Letter]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • May 07, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • March 20, 2019: [Letter]
  • March 08, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 08, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 08, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.