U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Campbell v. Ft. Madison Prison et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 20, 2019: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • May 07, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 07, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • May 06, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 11, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.