U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00007
  • Case Name: Adong v. CHI Health et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Statement]
  • May 12, 2021: [Witness List]
  • May 12, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • May 11, 2021: [Motion in Limine]
  • May 06, 2021: [Pretrial Order - Final]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • April 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 12, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • April 09, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 08, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • April 06, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • April 05, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 05, 2021: [Leave]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 02, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 02, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 02, 2021: [Statement]
  • April 02, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • April 02, 2021: [Leave]
  • April 02, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 02, 2021: [Trial Brief]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 26, 2021: [In Limine]
  • March 19, 2021: [In Limine]
  • March 16, 2021: [In Limine]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice - Other]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • June 11, 2020: [Stipulation]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 16, 2020: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • April 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 09, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 01, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 01, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 31, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 31, 2020: [Quash]
  • March 30, 2020: [Quash]
  • March 30, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 12, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 12, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 06, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 14, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 29, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 28, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 22, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 16, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 08, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 13, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 15, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 15, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • October 11, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice - Other]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice - Other]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • June 10, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 05, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 17, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 13, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 23, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 22, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 02, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 26, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 12, 2019: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • March 12, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.