U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00239
  • Case Name: Brown v. Bartruff, et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 02, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [USCA Order]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [USCA Scheduling Order]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Errata]
  • March 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2021
  • February 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Status Report]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Stay]
  • June 02, 2020: [Stay]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Errata]
  • May 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • January 27, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 02, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 02, 2019: [Status Report]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Status Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 07, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [Letter]
  • May 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Non-Appearance (Attorney General only)]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.