U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00074
  • Case Name: Hampton v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • September 13, 2019: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • September 13, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 13, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 01, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 21, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 13, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.