U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00083
  • Case Name: Law Offices of Jonathan Stein v. Glenn Golden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 03, 2019: [Consolidate Cases]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • May 09, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • May 08, 2019: [Reply]
  • May 08, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 07, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 18, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 10, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 05, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 02, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Consolidate Cases]
  • March 21, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2019: [Remand to State Court]
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • March 19, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 19, 2019: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.