U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00096
  • Case Name: Doe v. McCarthy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 11, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [Complaint]
  • March 28, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.