U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00099
  • Case Name: Munoz Rojas v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 22, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 22, 2019: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 16, 2019: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Affidavit]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Reconsideration]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • April 11, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.