U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Sarvestaney v. Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [USCA Order]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [USCA Order]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • October 16, 2019: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • October 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 09, 2019: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 03, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 29, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 28, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2019: [Expedite]
  • August 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 14, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 08, 2019: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 02, 2019: [Expedite]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 01, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 13, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • June 07, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • April 01, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 29, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.