U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-mj-00223-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendoza Palacios
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • April 15, 2019: [Response in Opposition/Resistance (Seal doc optional)]
  • April 12, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order]
  • April 11, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 05, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2019: [Bail/Bond Report (Sealed )]
  • April 02, 2019: [Detention]
  • April 02, 2019: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • April 02, 2019: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 02, 2019: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2019: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • April 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 02, 2019: [Interpreter Needed]
  • April 02, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.