U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Meyer v. Herndon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • August 26, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 08, 2020: [Status Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • March 10, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 09, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 04, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • March 04, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 02, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 24, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 14, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 10, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 07, 2020: [Leave to File]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Leave]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • October 18, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 22, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 02, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 03, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Notice of Consent]
  • May 07, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Reply]
  • April 22, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 19, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 05, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice of Consent]
  • April 05, 2019: [Errata]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.