U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00110
  • Case Name: Davis v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • November 17, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 27, 2020: [USCA Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • May 15, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 04, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.