U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00113
  • Case Name: Gabriel v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • October 04, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Stipulation]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice - Other]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
November, 2020
  • November 15, 2020: [Notice - Other]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 19, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • October 16, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice - Other]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 09, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice - Other]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Brief /Other]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 26, 2019: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • June 26, 2019: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • June 26, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 08, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
  • April 08, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 05, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.