U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-03012
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Stay]
  • April 06, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.