U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:19-cv-02012
  • Case Name: Floyd County Mutual Insurance Association v. CNH Industrial America LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 08, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • October 05, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 14, 2020: [Strike]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Certificate of Appealability]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 12, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.