U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00233
  • Case Name: Kudron v. McCarthy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 11, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 06, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 01, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 30, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • June 25, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 26, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 26, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 06, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 18, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 11, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • December 31, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 20, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 19, 2019: [Waiver]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order]
  • December 18, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 13, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 13, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
  • November 07, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 01, 2019: [Request for Waiver of Service]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice - Other]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order]
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • September 25, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 31, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 14, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 14, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Non-Appearance (Attorney General only)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 14, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • June 13, 2019: [Dismiss]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • April 15, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.