U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00118
  • Case Name: Haegele v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 06, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • April 05, 2021: [Dismiss]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 04, 2019: [Seal]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • July 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 23, 2019: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • July 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 22, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 22, 2019: [Seal]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Seal]
  • June 20, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 05, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Errata]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.