U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Daker v. American Equity Investment Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [USCA Order]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • February 01, 2021: [Subsequent Notice of Appeal]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • December 29, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 21, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 26, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • October 26, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • October 08, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • October 08, 2020: [Transfer Case]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Transfer Case]
  • September 28, 2020: [Reconsideration]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 21, 2020: [Strike]
  • August 21, 2020: [Bond]
  • August 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 13, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • January 13, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 06, 2020: [Reply]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 06, 2019: [Strike]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 19, 2019: [Reply]
  • November 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 12, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 01, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • October 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2019: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2019: [Bond]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 15, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.