U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00119
  • Case Name: Regenexx, LLC v. Regenx Health LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • March 18, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 17, 2020: [Transfer Case]
  • March 17, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 17, 2020: [Sanctions]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 17, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 03, 2019: [Sanctions]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 10, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 03, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 03, 2019: [Transfer Case]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 20, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 20, 2019: [Statement]
  • May 20, 2019: [Declaration]
  • May 20, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 10, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • May 07, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • May 03, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2019: [Affidavit]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • April 17, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 16, 2019: [Errata]
  • April 16, 2019: [Copyright/Patent/Trademark Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.