U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Houston v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 02, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • July 01, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 27, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 18, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 18, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.