U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Fredrickson v. McAwful et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Reconsideration]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 13, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 18, 2019: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • April 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.