U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-04016
  • Case Name: MicroSource, LLC et al v. Eco World Group, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 09, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • December 16, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 12, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • July 18, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • July 17, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • July 08, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 08, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • July 08, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 08, 2019: [Seal Document]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 24, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.