U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00123
  • Case Name: Rennenger v. Aquawood, L.L.C. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 29, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • April 28, 2025: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 25, 2025: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 25, 2025: [Objections to Bill of Costs]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Bill of Costs]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Motion in Limine]
  • March 27, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2025
  • January 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2024
  • December 16, 2024: [Notice - Other]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Compel]
  • December 07, 2022: [Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 16, 2022: [Compel]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 24, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 10, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 03, 2022: [Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 21, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 20, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 14, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 07, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 29, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [Compel]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • August 17, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 09, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 02, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 30, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 08, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 01, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 22, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 20, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 20, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • June 17, 2022: [Status Report]
  • June 15, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • May 25, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 10, 2022: [Errata]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 09, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Errata]
  • April 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 05, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • July 08, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • July 07, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice - Other]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Notice - Other]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 22, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 22, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 15, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 16, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • November 13, 2020: [Joinder]
  • November 13, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • November 13, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • November 13, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 13, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 13, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 09, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 02, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • September 02, 2020: [Strike]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 05, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 05, 2020: [Joinder]
  • August 04, 2020: [Joinder]
  • August 04, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 20, 2020: [Strike]
  • July 16, 2020: [Joinder]
  • July 15, 2020: [Strike]
  • July 14, 2020: [Leave]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Stay]
  • February 04, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2020: [Consolidate Cases]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Joinder]
  • January 07, 2020: [Errata]
  • January 07, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 06, 2020: [Joinder]
  • January 06, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 06, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 03, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice - Other]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Expedite]
  • November 25, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Quash]
  • November 25, 2019: [Stay]
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 14, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 05, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • November 01, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 01, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 21, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 11, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 08, 2019: [Joinder]
  • October 08, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 07, 2019: [Declaration]
  • October 07, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 07, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 04, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 03, 2019: [Declaration]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Expedite]
  • October 01, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Quash]
  • October 01, 2019: [Stay]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • September 17, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 09, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 06, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 06, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • September 04, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 04, 2019: [Default Entry by Clerk]
  • September 04, 2019: [Errata]
  • September 04, 2019: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • September 03, 2019: [Joinder]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Joinder]
  • August 30, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 30, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 29, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 29, 2019: [Joinder]
  • August 28, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 27, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 27, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 27, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 23, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • August 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 20, 2019: [Joinder]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2019: [Stay]
  • August 16, 2019: [Consolidate Cases]
  • August 16, 2019: [Default Entry by Clerk]
  • August 15, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • August 15, 2019: [Joinder]
  • August 14, 2019: [Stay]
  • August 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • July 29, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 24, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 25, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 20, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 18, 2019: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • June 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 04, 2019: [Consolidate Cases]
  • June 03, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 30, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 29, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2019: [Consolidate Cases]
  • May 24, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice - Other]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 19, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 19, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.