U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. Reynolds et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 26, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • April 25, 2022: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • April 20, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 07, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 01, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Permanent Injunction]
  • March 25, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • March 14, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 04, 2022: [Brief /Other]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Brief /Other]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Brief /Other]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • June 08, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 01, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 01, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 01, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 28, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • April 27, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 27, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 27, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 02, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 17, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • March 16, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 16, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 02, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Errata]
  • December 17, 2019: [Errata]
  • December 16, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 16, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 02, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 26, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • August 13, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 12, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 09, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 06, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 02, 2019: [Leave]
  • August 02, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Reply]
  • July 26, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 23, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • July 19, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 19, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 24, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • June 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 21, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 21, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • May 02, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 29, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 23, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 23, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 22, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.