U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00125
  • Case Name: Peterson et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • June 17, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 17, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 17, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 04, 2020: [Reply]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 08, 2020: [Errata]
  • April 06, 2020: [Consolidate Cases]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice - Other]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 03, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • January 03, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 03, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 25, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 25, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 25, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 24, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 21, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • May 06, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 23, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • April 23, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 22, 2019: [Certificate]
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.