U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:19-cv-02024
  • Case Name: Hoffert v. Covenant Medical Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 11, 2019: [Default Entry]
  • September 06, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 03, 2019: [Extension of Time]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 22, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.