U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00128
  • Case Name: Daniels v. Peterson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Letter]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 09, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • July 08, 2019: [Brief /Other]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • June 12, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • June 10, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 05, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • May 17, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 08, 2019: [Brief /Other]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 23, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 23, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.