U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-01010
  • Case Name: Wood et al v. Paccar Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Continue Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Quash]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • March 15, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 11, 2021: [In Limine]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 12, 2020: [In Limine]
  • October 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [In Limine]
  • August 20, 2020: [Seal]
  • August 20, 2020: [In Limine]
  • August 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2020: [Seal]
  • August 04, 2020: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • June 08, 2020: [Seal]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Seal]
  • May 18, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 18, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 18, 2020: [Exclude]
  • May 14, 2020: [Seal Document]
  • May 14, 2020: [Exclude]
  • May 04, 2020: [Exclude]
  • May 01, 2020: [Exclude]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • April 24, 2020: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Stay]
  • February 04, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 30, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 27, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 17, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 16, 2020: [Seal]
  • January 16, 2020: [Sanctions]
  • January 16, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 15, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 15, 2020: [Strike]
  • January 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Seal]
  • December 18, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • November 04, 2019: [Extension of Time]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Quash]
  • September 09, 2019: [Compel]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Protective Order]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 01, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 26, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2019: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.