U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Key Outdoor Inc v. Briggs et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 08, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 12, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • December 20, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sanctions]
  • December 09, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • November 19, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 14, 2019: [Sanctions]
  • November 07, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Compel]
  • November 05, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Compel]
  • October 18, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 10, 2019: [Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 06, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Status Report]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 28, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 20, 2019: [Statement]
  • May 14, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 08, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2019: [Status Report Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 08, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 08, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • May 06, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 06, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 03, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
  • May 02, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • April 24, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 24, 2019: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • April 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order of Entry]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.