U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00133
  • Case Name: Kelly v. Des Moines University et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 08, 2019: [Stipulation]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Stipulation]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 18, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • June 13, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 07, 2019: [Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 21, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 26, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 26, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 26, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.