U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00010
  • Case Name: Hill et al v. Family Connections, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • October 23, 2020: [Leave]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • October 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 29, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 24, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 26, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 07, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 06, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 06, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 19, 2020: [Notice - Other]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • May 14, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 16, 2020: [Errata]
  • March 16, 2020: [Protective Order]
February, 2020
  • February 17, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • February 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice - Other]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • January 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 10, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Dismiss]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Reply]
  • July 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 15, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 06, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 04, 2019: [Dismiss]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 08, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.