U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00126
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Real Property Located, et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Judgment - Consent]
  • June 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 09, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 01, 2021: [Affidavit in Support]
  • June 01, 2021: [Stipulation]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 26, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • May 14, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
  • April 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Errata]
  • June 26, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 24, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 13, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • June 03, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [TRO]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.