U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00136
  • Case Name: Tongyik v. Mmanga et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Stipulation]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Closing Documents]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 15, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 09, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Set Aside Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 07, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Sealed Document]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • February 28, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • February 11, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • January 15, 2020: [Default Entry by Clerk]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 02, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 02, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 18, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 17, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 17, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 13, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 03, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order]
  • August 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 23, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 29, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.