U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cv-00034
  • Case Name: Willet et al v. Johnson & Johnson, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • June 18, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 03, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • May 11, 2020: [Leave]
  • May 06, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 04, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • May 04, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Leave]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 17, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 13, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Certificate]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 24, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 31, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Reply]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sealed Document]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 31, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order]
  • May 31, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 31, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 31, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • May 30, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 23, 2019: [Status Report]
  • May 21, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • May 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 15, 2019: [Errata]
  • May 14, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order]
  • May 02, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice - Other]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • April 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 30, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.