U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00138
  • Case Name: Copeland v. Genesis Development et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Order]
  • August 17, 2020: [Certificate]
  • August 17, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • August 05, 2020: [Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • July 07, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order]
  • June 15, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2020: [Status Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order]
  • May 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • February 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • January 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 19, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 17, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 11, 2019: [Strike]
  • December 11, 2019: [Reply]
  • December 04, 2019: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • December 04, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 03, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 03, 2019: [Strike]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 19, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • November 19, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 14, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Reply]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 26, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 12, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 04, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 19, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • August 16, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 16, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 10, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2019: [Dismiss]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Reply]
  • June 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 12, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 12, 2019: [Errata]
  • June 12, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 29, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 29, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 28, 2019: [Reply]
  • May 21, 2019: [Reply]
  • May 15, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 07, 2019: [Dismiss]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • April 30, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.