U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00140
  • Case Name: Sundermann v. Golden Circle Real Estate Group, L.L.C.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 09, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 29, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 29, 2019: [Transcript]
  • October 28, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 10, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 04, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • August 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 13, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • August 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 07, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 06, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • July 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 23, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 23, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 17, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 17, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 11, 2019: [Errata]
  • July 10, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 09, 2019: [Errata]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 03, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • June 21, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • June 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 16, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 16, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 13, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 02, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.