U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-03019
  • Case Name: Hall v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Case Ready for Decision]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Brief]
  • November 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Brief]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.