U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00143
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Approximately 570 Pair of Assorted Nike and Adidas Shoes
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 16, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2022: [Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2022: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
February, 2022
  • February 27, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice of Consent]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • January 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Statement]
  • November 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • October 22, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 07, 2021: [Declaration]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 24, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 24, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 19, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 11, 2021: [Status Report]
  • August 04, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 03, 2021: [Brief /Other]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • July 19, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 25, 2021: [Status Report]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 20, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 18, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
  • April 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 01, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Protective Order]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • March 16, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 13, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice - Other]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 26, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • July 17, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Claim]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 13, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 12, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2019: [Writ Issued]
  • May 09, 2019: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • May 09, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.