U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00145
  • Case Name: Beckett v. Youth Homes Of Mid America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • April 02, 2020: [Mail Returned]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 25, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 18, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 16, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 10, 2019: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • May 10, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.