U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00146
  • Case Name: Brewbaker v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 12, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 10, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 05, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 04, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 04, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • February 04, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 04, 2020: [Permanent Injunction]
  • February 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 16, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 02, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Reply]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 26, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 23, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 19, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 09, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • August 09, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 06, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 05, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 05, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 05, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Reply]
  • July 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 30, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 29, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 22, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 03, 2019: [Mail Returned]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • June 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 24, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • June 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 21, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • June 11, 2019: [Seal]
  • June 11, 2019: [Errata]
  • June 11, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 10, 2019: [Seal]
  • June 07, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • June 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 04, 2019: [Permanent Injunction]
  • June 04, 2019: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • May 30, 2019: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • May 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 28, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • May 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 21, 2019: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • May 21, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • May 13, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 13, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 10, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 10, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.