U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00147
  • Case Name: Menard, Inc v. MSF Transport LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • January 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 21, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 21, 2021: [Jury Verdict]
  • January 21, 2021: [Witness List]
  • January 21, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • January 21, 2021: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • January 21, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • January 21, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 21, 2021: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • January 20, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 19, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 19, 2021: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • January 19, 2021: [Jury Selection]
  • January 19, 2021: [Jury Challenge Sheet (Sealed)]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 15, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • January 15, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order]
  • January 08, 2021: [Witness List]
  • January 08, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Pretrial Order - Stipulated]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • December 28, 2020: [Motion in Limine]
  • December 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 23, 2020: [Errata]
  • December 22, 2020: [Trial Brief]
  • December 22, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 22, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 21, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • December 21, 2020: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [Statement]
  • December 21, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 21, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 21, 2020: [Trial Brief]
  • December 08, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • December 08, 2020: [In Limine]
  • December 08, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • December 08, 2020: [Witness List]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Protective Order]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 24, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [New Trial]
  • May 11, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 11, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 11, 2020: [New Trial]
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice - Other]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • January 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice - Other]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice - Other]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 22, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 19, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 17, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order]
  • June 26, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 26, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 11, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 10, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • May 14, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 13, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.