U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00039
  • Case Name: US Foods, Inc. v. Maingredient, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 16, 2019: [Judgment - Default]
  • July 15, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • July 01, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Default Entry by Clerk]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 24, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 23, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 15, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • May 14, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 13, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.