U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00042
  • Case Name: American Income Life Insurance Company v. Nkumu et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Deposit Funds]
  • January 24, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Seal]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.